This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/01/2023 at 15:06:43 (UTC).

County of Mono et al. v. City of Los Angeles et al.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 County of Mono filed an Other lawsuit against City of Los Angeles. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grillo, Evelio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2590

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Grillo, Evelio

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

Sierra Club

County of Mono

Appellants

City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power

City of Los Angeles

Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Board of Commissioners

Interested Party

California Department of Fish and Wildlife

Not Yet Classified

North Yuba Water District

Byron-Bethany Irrigation District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

Laurens Herby Silver

Donald Burns Mooney

Stacey Simon

Appellant Attorneys

Michael Nelson Feuer

Julie Conboy Riley

David J Edwards

Amrit Satish Kulkarni

Julia L. Bond

Edward Grutzmacher

Interested Party Attorneys

Nhu Q Nguyen

Adam Leonard Levitan

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kelley Morgan Taber

 

Court Documents

A162590

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order granting publication filed.; Notes: The opinion in the above-entitled matter filed on June 30, 2022, was not certified for publication in the Official Reports. For good cause it now appears that the opinion should be published in the Official Reports and it is so ordered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to Request for Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed request to publish opinion.; Notes: By North Yuba Water District and Byron-Bethany Irrigation District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed in full; Disposition Type: Final The trial court's judgment is reversed.; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Brown, Tracie L.; Participants: Desautels, Tara M. (Concur) Pollak, Stuart R. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The trial court's judgment is reversed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court?s own motion, the oral argument hearing remains calendared for Tuesday, April 26, 2022, but the time has been advanced from 10:50 a.m. to 10:10 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of Lodging of Record of Evidence2 flash drives (both copies); now in a gray exhibit envelope; for the court to keep;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/22/2021 By 30 Day(s) aob stip; 8/23/21 to 9/22/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-2(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 05/17/2021. No additional designations.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 05/12/2021. Designating 8.124 with RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: City of Los Angeles Attorney: Amrit Satish Kulkarni (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: City of Los AngelesAttorney: Amrit Satish Kulkarni; Notes: (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 05/05/2021 by Counsel for Respondents City of Los Angeles et al. appealing judgment from 05/03/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG18923377; Trial Court Judge: Grillo, Evelio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less