This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/09/2023 at 07:06:52 (UTC).

County of Los Angeles et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 County of Los Angeles filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Feeney, Jill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5617

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Feeney, Jill

 

Party Details

Petitioners

County of Los Angeles

Pamela Anne Nelzon

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Jill Feeney

Interested Party

Kristi Ann Larsen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Patrick E. Stockalper

Attorney at Kjar, McKenna & Stockalper, LLP

841 Apollo St Suite 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Kelly A. Ward

Attorney at KJAR, MCKENNA & STOCKALPER LLP

841 Apollo Street Suite 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 312 N. Spring Street, Dept. 30

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Gary A. Dordick

Attorney at Law Offices of Gary A. Dordick

509 South Beverly Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-4514

Christopher V. Bulone

Attorney at Dordick Law Corporation

509 S. Beverly Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Jennifer Brannen Smith

Attorney at Law Offices of C. Ray Carlson

27951 Smyth Dr Ste 101

Valencia, CA 91355

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for a writ of mandate filed January 13, 2023. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: volume 2 of exhibits with bookmarks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: volume 1 of exhibits with bookmarks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Non-compliance sent to counsel for Petitioner due to missing descriptive bookmarks.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two volumes of Exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Prohibition, or other appropriate relief; immediate Stay requested of the trial court proceedings; Memorandum of points and authorities.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less