This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/14/2022 at 23:32:55 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH v. S.C. (CALIFORNIA RESTAURANT ASSOCIATION)

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH filed an Other lawsuit against C CALIFORNIA RESTAURANT ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8101

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Barbara Ferrer

County of Los Angeles, Department of Public Health

Muntu Davis

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

California Restaurant Association, Inc.

Mark's Engine Company No. 28 Restaurant, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Edward Morrissey

Attorney at Office County Counsel

500 West Temple Street, Suite 648

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3196

Marc J. Poster

Attorney at Greines Martin Stein & Richland

5900 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036-3659

Rodrigo Alejandro Castro-Silva

Attorney at Los Angeles County Office of the County Counsel

500 West Temple Street, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Judy Whitehurst

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

500 West Temple Street Suite 468

Los Angeles, CA 90012-2713

Natasha Mosley

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

500 West Temple Street Suite 468

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Amnon Z. Siegel

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, #1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jason H. Tokoro

Attorney at Miller Barondess, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Minh-Van T. Do

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Timothy T. Coates

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Dennis S. Ellis

Attorney at Brown George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis, LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2228

Katherine F. Murray

Attorney at Brown George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis, LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ryan Q Keech

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Eric Marc George

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lori Sambol Brody

Attorney at Brown George ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Carl Alan Roth

Attorney at Brown George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

801 South Figueroa Street Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Noah S. Helpern

Attorney at Brown George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

801 South Figueroa Steet Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Richard A. Schwartz

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

801 South Figueroa Street Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Matthew M. Hoesly

Attorney at Geragos & Geragos, APC

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3411

Mark J. Geragos

Attorney at Geragos & Geragos

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3411

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petitions for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petitions for review denied; Notes: The petitions for review are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including July 7, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Mark's Engine Company No. 28 Restaurant, LLC Attorney: Mark J. Geragos Reply to answer to petition filed. Due on 05/17/2021 By 7 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of real party in interest Mark's Engine Company No. 28 Restaurant, LLC and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the reply to answer to petition for review is extended to and including May 17, 2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: Requesting a 7-day extension to May 17, 2021 to file the reply to answer to petition for review. Mark's Engine Company No. 28 Restaurant, LLC, Real Party in Interest Mark J. Geragos, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: California Restaurant Association, Inc. Attorney: Dennis S. Ellis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: County of Los Angeles, Department of Public Health Attorney: Timothy T. Coates Petitioner: Barbara Ferrer Attorney: Timothy T. Coates Petitioner: Muntu Davis Attorney: Timothy T. Coates Combined answer to petition for review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: 2nd petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Mark's Engine Company No. 28 Restaurant, LLC Attorney: Mark J. Geragos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: California Restaurant Association, Inc. Attorney: Dennis S. Ellis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B309416; Disposition: Petition granted by opinion; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCP03881; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV45134

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SOCIAL SERVICES, A POLITICAL is a litigant

Latest cases where MARKS ENGINE COMPANY NO. 28 RESTAURANT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA RESTAURANT ASSOCIATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant