This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2023 at 02:18:09 (UTC).

County of Alameda v. Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 County of Alameda filed an Other lawsuit against Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brand, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7040

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brand, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

County of Alameda

Defendants and Appellants

Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc.

Montclair Village Hardware

Marcus Crawley

Thomas Rubin

Steve Slauson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Jeffrey Ruderman

Michael G. Colantuono

John Allan Abaci

Conor William Harkins

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Jason A. Bezis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 07/21/2023 By 58 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: The parties' joint motion to consolidate cases A167040 and A167478 is granted. These two cases are consolidated for briefing, argument and decision. All future filings shall list both Court of Appeal and superior Court case numbers in the caption, but shall be filed only in case A167040. The deadline for appellant's consolidated opening brief is May 24, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Joint motion to consolidate A167040 and A167478; form Jason Bezis and Colantunon Highsmith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order on motion filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The court defers ruling on respondent's March 2, 2023 motion to dismiss the appeal and request for judicial notice, and appellants' April 17, 2023 request for judicial notice until the court's decision on the merits. (See People v. Preslie (1977) 70 Cal.App.3d 486, 493-494 ["[b]ecause the propriety of taking judicial notice usually requires an analysis of the substantive issues involved, the decision whether or not judicial notice will in fact be taken will normally be postponed and made at the time the cause is considered on the merits"]; see also First District Local Rules, rule 6(b).) Although the motion to dismiss is deferred, the parties are still required to file their briefs. Appellants' opening brief remains due on May 15, 2023. Any future documents filed by counsel shall comply with California Rules of Court, rule 8.74(a)(3), which requires descriptive electronic bookmarks. Appellants' counsel is admonished that future filings that do not fully comply with Rule 8.74 may be rejected.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to Motion to Dismiss from attorney Jason Bezis for appellants filed with deficiency: missing descriptive electronic bookmarks (CRC 8.74(a)(3))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: from attorney Jason Bezis for appellants in support of motion to dismiss filed with deficiency: missing descriptive electronic bookmarks (CRC 8.74(a)(3))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Due on 04/17/2023 By 14 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Requested for 04/17/2023 By 14 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: from attorney John Abaci for respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: from attorney John Abaci for respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check # 218 - Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc. Attorney: Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Deadline was 02/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 07/21/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc.Attorney: Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc.Attorney: Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/19/2023 by Counsel for Defendants Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc. et al. appealing order from 11/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG20070099; Trial Court Judge: Brand, Jeffrey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less