This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/05/2023 at 01:23:28 (UTC).

County of Alameda v. Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 County of Alameda filed an Other lawsuit against Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brand, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6401

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brand, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

County of Alameda

Defendants and Appellants

Montclair Village Hardware

Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc.

Marcus Crawley

Thomas Rubin

Steve Slauson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

David Jeffrey Ruderman

Conor William Harkins

John Allan Abaci

Michael G. Colantuono

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Jason A. Bezis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 06/02/2023 By 60 Day(s) see Order filed Apr. 6, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Respondents' March 20, 2023 motion to expedite briefing and for calendar preference is denied. Appellants' April 3, 2023 request for extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief must be filed no later than June 2, 2023. Absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances beyond the control of the parties, the court does not anticipate granting any further requested extensions of time for briefing (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.60(b), 8.63(b).) No automatic extensions shall apply (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.220(a).) The justices will be familiar with the facts and issues, will have conferred among themselves on the case, and will not require oral argument. If oral argument is requested, the court anticipates calendaring the matter as soon as practicable. If oral argument is waived, the court will submit the cause for decision and will issue its opinion as soon as practicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to Motion to Expedite Briefing from attorney Jason Bezis for appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: opposition to motion to expedite briefing; missing descriptive electronic bookmarks (CRC 8.74(a)(3))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: attorney John Abaci for respondents dated Apr. 3, 2023 opposing appellant's Apr. 3 request for extension of time and future requests

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 06/02/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to Expedite Briefing and for Calendar Preference from attorney John Abaci for respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order on motion filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The court defers ruling on respondents' December 20, 2022 motions to dismiss the appeals and appellants' February 3, 2023 requests for judicial notice until the court's decision on the merits. (See People v. Preslie (1977) 70 Cal.App.3d 486, 493-494 ["[b]ecause the propriety of taking judicial notice usually requires an analysis of the substantive issues involved, the decision whether or not judicial notice will in fact be taken will normally be postponed and made at the time the cause is considered on the merits"]; see also First District Local Rules, rule 6(b).) The consolidated opening brief shall be filed no later than April 3, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: The stipulated motion to consolidate these two appeals - filed on March 10, 2023 - is granted. Cases A166401 and A166404 are consolidated for all future proceedings. All filings shall list both Court of Appeal case numbers, and both Alameda Superior Court case numbers, but shall be filed only in case A166401.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of John Abaci in support of motion to dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: from attorney John Abaci for respondents; cip included

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc. Attorney: Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 06/02/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc.Attorney: Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Alameda County Taxpayers' Association, Inc.Attorney: Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Deadline was 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 212, Jason A. Bezis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 10/20/2022 by Counsel for Defendants ACTA, Inc. et al. appealing judgment from 09/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG20070099; Trial Court Judge: Brand, Jeffrey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less