This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/14/2023 at 03:02:54 (UTC).

Corinthian International Wage and Hour Cases

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 Corinthian International Wage and Hour Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucas, Patricia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0821

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucas, Patricia

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Adrian Turner

Mykale Rocquemore

Appellant and Defendant

Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Christopher Leimbach

Arby Aiwazian

Douglas Han

Carolyn Hunt Cottrell

Edwin Aiwazian

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Aleshia Mae White

Thomas P. Murphy

Susan Elizabeth Bishop

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 11/13/2023 By 84 Day(s) 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 11/13/2023 By 84 Day(s) 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Request for extension of time is missing the requested date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: 60 Stipulation for both AOB & RB.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB due in 40 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant, order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Notice of compliance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 3/9/12 RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS rejected, missing party information.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc., filed 02/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 16CV292208; Trial Court Judge: Lucas, Patricia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less