This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2023 at 06:10:39 (UTC).

Cooper v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Cooper filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Vu, Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1983

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Vu, Nathan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tawana Jean Cooper

La Mirada, CA 90638

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon Nathan Vu Dept N-15 700 Civic Center West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Optum Services, Inc

Optumrx, Inc

United Healthcare Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

JaVon Aubrey Payton

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

200 Spectrum Center Dr Ste 500

Irvine, CA 92618-5005

Ellen E Cohen

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

725 S Figueroa St Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Supreme Court Copy petitioner's notice of errata regarding cover page.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: e-Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate and request for immediate stay are DENIED. BEDSWORTH, ACTING P. J. * Before Bedsworth, Acting P. J., Moore, J., and Motoike, J.Copy of order mailed to petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Pursuant to the filing of a Request to Waive Court Fees and Costs, and with good cause appearing therefor, IT IS ORDERED that appellate court fees and costs for the above-entitled action are waived pursuant to rule 8.26. This fee waiver applies only to the appellate fees and costs identified in California Rules of Court, rule 8.26(e) [appellate court filing fee; court fee for telephonic oral argument]. Any request for a waiver of superior court costs and fees must be addressed to the superior court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Amended petition filed.; Notes: By pet, petition w/corrected pagination.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Your petition for writ of mandate filed in this court was not accompanied by the statutory filing fee of $775.00, as required by Government Code section 68926. Your petition may be dismissed within 15 days of this notice unless you either transmit the filing fee of $775.00 or show good cause why the payment of said fee should be excused. Enclosed for your convenience is a Request to waive court fees and costs.Mailed to Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: By Petitioner Tawana Jean Cooper (29 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPTUMRX, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases where OPTUM SERVICES INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant