This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/10/2021 at 00:30:00 (UTC).

Cooper v. Technogym, S.p.A.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Cooper filed an Other lawsuit against Technogym, S p A. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0941

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hayashi, Dennis

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

John Cooper

Respondents and Defendants

24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.

Technogym USA Corporation

Technogym, S.p.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph S. May

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph S. May

1388 Sutter Street, Suite 810

San Francisco, CA 94109

Mark Thurston Baller

Attorney at Mark Baller, Esq.

1519 Kavanaugh Dr

E Palo Alto, CA 94303-1133

Craig M. Peters

Attorney at Altair Law

465 California Street - 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jack Clifford Nick

Attorney at Prindle, Amaro, Goetz, Hillyard, Barnes & Reinholtz LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Dale A. Arakawa

Po Box 954

Seal Beach, CA 90740--954

Robert John Romero

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

1 California Street - 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5895

Edward Francis Donohue

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

One California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check #2060

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: John Cooper Attorney: Joseph S. May

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: civil case information statement; must specify all participating parties with their appellate and trial court designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: John CooperAttorney: Joseph S. May

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 09/14/2020 by Counsel for Plaintiff John Cooper appealing order from 07/16/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG17882459; Trial Court Judge: Hayashi, Dennis

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TECHNOGYM USA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where 24 HOUR FITNESS USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALLER, MARK T