This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/21/2022 at 19:00:48 (UTC).

COOPER v. COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 COOPER filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4414

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Tramaine Cooper

Respondent and Defendant

County of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory S. Cilli

Attorney at The Feldman Law Group

329 Pennsylvania Avenue

San Diego, CA 92103

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Welsh

Attorney at San Diego County - County Counsel

1600 Pacific Coast Highway, Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101

Juan Fernando Kish

Attorney at San Diego Office of County Counsel

1600 Pacific Coast Highway, Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101-2437

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certification of interested entities or persons filed; Notes: County of San Diego, Defendant and Respondent Christopher J. Welsh, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certification of interested entities or persons filed; Notes: Tramaine Cooper, Plaintiff and Appellant Gregory S. Cilli, Appellate defender

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent requesting certification of interested parties/entities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; briefing deferred; Notes: The petition for review is granted. Further action in this matter is deferred pending consideration and disposition of Tansavatdi v. City of Rancho Palos Verdes, S267453 (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(d)(2)), or pending further order of the court. Submission of additional briefing, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.520, is deferred pending further order of the court. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger, Groban, Jenkins and Guerrero, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including August 4, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: County of San Diego Attorney: Christopher J. Welsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tramaine Cooper Attorney: Gregory S. Cilli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D077872; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2018-00026166-CU-PA-CTL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welsh, Christopher J