This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/27/2023 at 11:06:05 (UTC).

Contreras v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Contreras filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brazile, Kevin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2204

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brazile, Kevin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Emely Contreras

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Kevin C. Brazile

Interested Parties

Kaiser Permanente International

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Mark Allen Kleiman

Attorney at Kleiman/Rajaram

12121 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 810

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Pooja Rajaram

Attorney at Kleiman/ Rajaram

12121 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 810

Los Angeles, CA 90025-3538

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 20

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Gregory G. Lynch

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 S. 5Th St. Ste. 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lee M. Thies

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S276339]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including December 8, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: service copy of letter filed in the Supreme Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: E-sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: filed by petitioner in the Supreme Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for a writ of mandate filed August 9, 2022. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Filed petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THIES LEE MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYNCH GREGORY G.