This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/22/2023 at 01:14:24 (UTC).

Contreras v. 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Contreras filed an Other lawsuit against 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fruin, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7023

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fruin, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Rafael Contreras

Defendant and Appellant

99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Eric A. Panitz

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Robert M. Dato

David Van Pelt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 10/19/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Rafael Contreras Attorney: Eric A. Panitz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Respondent's brief received and rejected this date for lack of bookmarks_All briefs must include electronic bookmarks to each heading, subheading and component of the document. California Rules of Court, rule 8.74 https://www.courts.ca.gov/documents/2DCA-Electronic-Formatting-Req-Guide.pdf and https://www.courts.ca.gov/documents/DCASC-Adobe-PDF-Bookmark-Zoom-Settings.pdf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 10/19/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.Attorney: David Van Pelt Attorney: Robert M. Dato

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Rafael ContrerasAttorney: Eric A. Panitz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: 1 volume [167 pages]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC. Attorney: David Van Pelt Attorney: Robert M. Dato

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.Attorney: David Van Pelt Attorney: Robert M. Dato

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed February 1, 2023, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: Lodged reporters transcript (dated Dec. 6, 2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC. Attorney: David Van Pelt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.Attorney: David Van Pelt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief / to be lodged reporter transcript are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 14, 2023: RT to be lodged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Feb. 1, 2023: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV21876; Trial Court Judge: Fruin, Jr., Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less