This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/16/2021 at 14:30:00 (UTC).

Connect Work Thrive LLC v. Quixey, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Connect Work Thrive LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Quixey, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arand, Mary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8730

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Arand, Mary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Connect Work Thrive LLC

Respondents and Defendants

The Brenner Group

Armanino LLP

Quixey, Inc.

Michael Hogan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Omair Maqsood Farooqui

Attorney at Palo Alto Legal Group, P.C.

1023 Corporation Way 2Nd Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Michael W. Stebbins

Attorney at Silicon Valley Law Group

1 North Market St Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Rec'd co. notice to appellant re: estimate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance, filed 2/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Applt, order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The Civil Case Information Statement (Form APP-004) you filed in the above entitled appeal pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100 (g), is being returned pursuant to Local Rule 4 because you failed to attach the following required documents: I. A copy of the judgment or order being appealed, including: i. A judgment of dismissal, if the appeal challenges a judgment entered after: a) an order granting summary judgment, or b) an order sustaining a demurrer without leave to amend, or c) an order granting judgment on the pleadings; ii. If appealing an order made after judgment (Code Civ. Proc. 904.1, subd. (a)(2)), a copy of the final judgment or order of dismissal that predated the order being appealed (see Code Civ. Proc., 577, 581d); II. A copy of the proof of service from the clerk of the superior court or any party's notice of entry of the order or judgment being appealed; or, if neither the clerk of the superior court nor any party served a proof of service or notice of entry, a statement that no such document exists III. If claiming an extension of time to file the appeal pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.108(b), (c), (d) or (e), a copy of the court's order granting or denying the applicable motion; IV. The proof of service or notice of entry of any order granting or denying the applicable motion that would allow an extension of time to appeal; or, if neither the clerk of the superior court nor any party served a proof of service or notice of entry, a statement that no such document exists; V. Additional documents necessary to establish jurisdiction as follows: You must resubmit the Civil Case Information Statement with the required documents within 15 days of the date of this notice. You are hereby advised that if you fail to provide the documents specified above, or to notify the court in writing why the documents cannot be provided, the court may, on its own motion or upon motion of any party, issue an order to show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case info statement returned per local rule 4. Letter sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Applt's default notice filed 1/29/21: - The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.100(b)(2). - Notice designating reporter's transcript or notice of intent to proceed without reporter's transcript not timely filed. - Notice designating record for clerk's transcript not timely filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Connect Work Thrive LLC, filed 12/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: CV319483; Trial Court Judge: Arand, Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Brenner Group is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMANINO LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP; is a litigant