This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/20/2022 at 02:03:50 (UTC).

Connary et al. v. S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Connary filed an Other lawsuit against C Johnson Son, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Seligman, Brad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4393

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Seligman, Brad

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Donna Connary

Zoriana Pawluk-Florio

Adrienne Andry

Paul Torrecillas

S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc.

Appellant

Steven F. Helfand

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant and Respondent

S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Wyatt A. Lison

Attorney at Feinstein Doyle Payne & Kravec, LLC

Law & Finance Building St.1300 429 Fourth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Kelsey Nelson Harrison

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

707 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

David Frank McDowell, Jr

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Kelsey Nelson Harrison

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

707 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

David Frank McDowell, Jr

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Appellant Steven F. Helfand having filed a Request for Dismissal on March 3, 2022, this appeal is hereby dismissed. The clerk of this court is directed to concurrently file this order and issue the remittitur.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Appellant Steven F. Helfand having filed a Request for Dismissal on March 3, 2022, this appeal is hereby dismissed. The clerk of this court is directed to concurrently file this order and issue the remittitur.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Filed by Steven Helfand, appellant in pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Steven F. Helfand Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Steven F. HelfandPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid via credit card by appellant Helfand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 01/19/2022. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/19/2022 by Appellant Steven F. Helfand in propria persona appealing judgment from 12/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG20061675; Trial Court Judge: Seligman, Brad

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDOWELL, DAVID F