This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/22/2022 at 00:03:38 (UTC).

Community Venture Partners v. Marin County Open Space District

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Community Venture Partners filed an Other lawsuit against Marin County Open Space District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sweet, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1851

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sweet, Andrew

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Community Venture Partners

Respondent

Marin County Open Space District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorney

Michael W. Graf

227 Behrens Street

El Cerrito, CA 94530

Respondent Attorney

Brandon William Halter

Attorney at Marin County Counsel

3501 Civic Center Drive, Room 275

San Rafael, CA 94903

 

Court Documents

A161851

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record returned from Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed & remanded to trial court w/directions; Disposition Type: Final The order discharging the preemptory writ of mandate is reversed. The trial court is directed to vacate that order and enter a new order (1) stating the District's return did not demonstrate compliance with the peremptory writ of mandate; (2) denying the District's request for an order discharging the writ; and (3) ordering the District to comply with the writ as affirmed in CVP I. The order denying attorney fees is reversed and remanded for a redetermination of whether CVP is entitled to attorney fees pursuant to section 1021.5.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Brown, Tracie L.; Participants: Pollak, Stuart R. (Concur) Streeter, Jon B. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The order discharging the preemptory writ of mandate is reversed. The trial court is directed to vacate that order and enter a new order (1) stating the District's return did not demonstrate compliance with the peremptory writ of mandate; (2) denying the District's request for an order discharging the writ; and (3) ordering the District to comply with the writ as affirmed in CVP I. The order denying attorney fees is reversed and remanded for a redetermination of whether CVP is entitled to attorney fees pursuant to section 1021.5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court.; Notes: efile notification sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument order sent.; Notes: 2.10.22 at 10:10 am;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: atty Michael Graf for aplts;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Community Venture PartnersAttorney: Michael W. Graf; Notes: (order attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: R-1(e-filed) **ENTIRE RECORD ELECTRONIC**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Filed 02/03/2021 by N. Johnson. Record has been electronically transmitted to the Court of Appeal. Administrative record in A154867 is incorporated by reference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1037, Michael W. Graf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Notice of Intent to Incorporated Record on Appeal filed 01/13/2021 by N. Johnson. The administrative record previously transmitted to the Court of Appeal is hereby incorporated by reference from A154867.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 01/12/2021. Designating 8.124 with RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/30/2020 by Counsel for Petitioner Community Venture Partners appealing order from 11/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Marin County Superior Court; County: Marin; Trial Court Case Number: CIV1701913; Trial Court Judge: Sweet, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marin County Open Space District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Graf