This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/02/2023 at 06:05:53 (UTC).

Command Performance Constructors, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 Command Performance Constructors, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosales, Olivia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2470

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosales, Olivia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Command Performance Constructors, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Olivia Rosales

Interested Parties

Siakimativa Simeta

Alfredo Perez

Lyle Parks Jr. Construction

Alberta Tierra Luna Managementm LLC

PCCP IRG Downey, LLC

Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.

Twin City Fire Insurance Company

Crew Inc.

Colonial Electric, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Austin Haigh

Maurice L. Chenier

Respondent Attorney

Court Counsel

Interested Party Attorneys

Jerold David Sullivan

John Kelly Sullivan

Mauro Fiore, Jr.

Gilbert Perez

Matthew Jay Eschenburg

Richard William Vanis, Jr.

Ayhan M Menekshe

Sondra Elizabeth Kirwan

Stephen M. Hayes

Ryan Zachary Keller

Benjamin L. Chen

Sonia Sheber Waisman

Heather Lynn McCloskey

Michael David Hirsch

Abel Eric Aguilera

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed August 18, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed August 18, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Frederick Bennett old email 1: fbennett@lacourt.org new email 1: courtcounselwrits@lacourt.org old email 2: PNguyen1@lacourt.org; LGershon@LACourt.org new email 2: {blank}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Motion to file records under seal in support of petition for writ of mandamus.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less