This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/26/2023 at 19:04:41 (UTC).

Command Performance Constructors, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 Command Performance Constructors, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosales, Olivia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2470

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosales, Olivia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Command Performance Constructors, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Olivia Rosales

Norwalk, CA 90650

Interested Parties

Siakimativa Simeta

Alfredo Perez

Lyle Parks Jr. Construction

Alberta Tierra Luna Managementm LLC

PCCP IRG Downey, LLC

Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.

Twin City Fire Insurance Company

Crew Inc.

Colonial Electric, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Austin Haigh

Attorney at Resnick & Louis

9891 Irvine Center Drive Ste 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Maurice L. Chenier

Attorney at Resnick & Louis, P.C.

3700 Wilshire Blvd Suite 557

Los Angeles, CA 90010-5020

Respondent Attorney

Court Counsel

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Jerold David Sullivan

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan

120 S Sepulveda #C

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

John Kelly Sullivan

Attorney at Sullivan & Sullivan

120 S Sepulveda

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Mauro Fiore, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Mauro Fiore, Jr.

136 E. Lemon Ave.

Monrovia, CA 91016-2808

Gilbert Perez

Attorney at Law Offices of Mauro Fiore, Jr.

136 E Lemon Ave

Monrovia, CA 91016-2808

Richard William Vanis, Jr.

Attorney at Mokri Vanis & Jones LLP

4100 Newport Place Dr. Ste 840

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2442

Matthew Jay Eschenburg

Attorney at Mokri Vanis & Jones LLP

4100 Newport Place Dr. Suite 840

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Ayhan M Menekshe

Attorney at MENEKSHE LAW FIRM

950 E Campbell Ave

Campbell, CA 95008-2366

Sondra Elizabeth Kirwan

Attorney at Menekshe Law Firm

950 E Campbell Ave

Campbell, CA 95008

Stephen M. Hayes

Attorney at Hayes, Scott, Bonino, Ellingson & McLay, LLC

203 Redwood Shores Pkwy Suite 480

San Carlos, CA 94070

Ryan Zachary Keller

Attorney at Hayes Scott Bonino Ellingson Guslani

999 Skyway Road, Suite 310

San Carlos, CA 94070

Benjamin L. Chen

Attorney at Hayes Scott Bonino Ellingson et al.

999 Skyway Road, Suite 310

San Carlos, CA 94070

Heather Lynn McCloskey

Attorney at McCloskey, Waring, Waisman & Drury LLP

12671 High Bluff Dr Ste 350

San Diego, CA 92130

Sonia Sheber Waisman

Attorney at McCloskey, Waring & Waisman, LLP

1960 East Grand Ave., Suite 580

El Segundo, CA 90245

Michael David Hirsch

Attorney at Christensen Hsu Sipes LLP

1629 Cravens Ave

Torrance, CA 90501-3203

Abel Eric Aguilera

Attorney at The Aguilera Law Group

700 S. Flower Street, Suite 3350

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed August 18, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed August 18, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Frederick Bennett old email 1: fbennett@lacourt.org new email 1: courtcounselwrits@lacourt.org old email 2: PNguyen1@lacourt.org; LGershon@LACourt.org new email 2: {blank}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Motion to file records under seal in support of petition for writ of mandamus.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS DBA COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS INC. is a litigant