This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/13/2022 at 16:37:48 (UTC).

COLOMBO v. S.C. (KINKLE, RODIGER & SPRIGGS)

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 COLOMBO filed an Other lawsuit against C KINKLE, RODIGER SPRIGGS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0860

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ralph Colombo

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675

Respondent

Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Honorable Maria Hernandez 700 Civic Center West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Kinkle, Rodiger & Spriggs

Andrew J. Pyka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Robert T. Dolan

Attorney at Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan

11400 W Olympic Boulevard, Suite 425

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1561

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Ralph Colombo Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Ralph Colombo Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G060578; Disposition: Order dismissing petition; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2021-01181945

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kinkle, Rodiger & Spriggs is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLAN ROBERT TRACEY