This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/03/2022 at 12:19:06 (UTC).

COLOMBO v. KINKLE, RODIGER & SPRIGGS

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 COLOMBO filed an Other lawsuit against KINKLE, RODIGER SPRIGGS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4314

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ralph Colombo

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675

Respondents

Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Linda S. Marks 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Kinkle, Rodiger & Spriggs

Andrew J. Pyka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Robert T. Dolan

Attorney at Gaglione, Dolan & Kaplan a Professional Corp.

11400 W. Olympic Blvd., Ste. 425

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1561

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Ralph Colombo Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Ralph Colombo Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G061245; Disposition: Order dismissing petition; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2016-00869183

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less