This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/22/2022 at 01:33:59 (UTC).

Collins et al. v. Hasa, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Collins filed an Other lawsuit against Hasa, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4316

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Zerius Collins

Alex Guerrero

Defendant and Appellant

Hasa, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kayvon Sabourian

Attorney at Matern Law Group

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266-2497

Matthew J. Matern

Attorney at Matern Law Group

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Launa N. Adolph

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Debra Janet Tauger

Attorney at Matern Law Group, PC

1230 Rosecrans Ave Ste 200

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266-2497

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

E. Sean McLoughlin

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP

300 South Grand Avenue One California Plaza, 37Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondents' unopposed request for judicial notice in support of their reply to the opposition to motion to dismiss appeal is granted. Respondents? opposed motion to dismiss this appeal is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Respondent's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal; Declaration; [Proposed] Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Respondent's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal; Declaration; [Proposed] Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal (filed w/permission)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and RJN in Support of the Reply (to court for permission to file)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss"APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Due on 04/06/2022 By 8 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Requested for 04/06/2022 By 8 Day(s) (stipulated)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Respondent (in motion to dismiss)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: Respondent's Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Hasa, Inc. Attorney: E. Sean McLoughlin E. Sean McLoughlin, attorney for appellant, with copy of Order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Hasa, Inc.Attorney: E. Sean McLoughlin; Notes: E. Sean McLoughlin, attorney for appellant, with copy of Order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: telephone credit card payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/03/2022 by Counsel for Defendant Hasa, Inc. appealing order from 12/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1802413

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hasa Construction, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLOUGHLIN EDWARD SEAN