This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/09/2022 at 02:26:40 (UTC).

Cole v. Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Cole filed an Other lawsuit against Los Angeles City Attorney's Office. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Meiers, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5390

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Meiers, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Onica V. Cole

Alhambra, CA 91801

Respondent and Defendant

Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Jorge Miguel Otano-Guilbe

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney Los Angeles

200 North Main Streetet 800 City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed September 16, 2021, is dismissed. In addition the Court notes that appellant has also failed to file a Case Information Statement. (2DCA/APP-004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Sept. 16, 2021: Onica Valle Cole ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sept. 16, 2021: Onica Valle Cole

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OTANO-GUILBE JORGE MIGUEL