This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/25/2022 at 19:00:47 (UTC).

Coachella Valley Water District v. The Superior Court; Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Coachella Valley Water District filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sykes, Sunshine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8325

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sykes, Sunshine

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Coachella Valley Water District

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael G. Colantuono

Pamela Kentos Graham

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Interested Party Attorneys

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Sara Marie McDuffie

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: and application for stay, denied (dtd Mar 4, 2022). Request for judicial notice granted. S273383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: by petitioner; S273383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: and request for immediate stay denied. Slough McKinster Raphael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by RPI to petitoner's motion for immediate stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: RPI re: will be filing an opposition to petitioner's request for immediate stay, no later than Feb 24, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.; Notes: by petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: by petitioner, in support of reply to preliminary opposition to writ petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: preliminary opposition to writ petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: by RPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: RPI's request for judicial notice - chronological index entitled logical index, missing bookmark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: RPI'S Req for judicial ntc - must comply with MISC. Order 19-16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: petition by RPI Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee by RPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 volume (corrected)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 volume (32 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: 1 volume of exhibits - pagination, missing table of contents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 4 vols

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less