This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/25/2022 at 19:00:47 (UTC).

Coachella Valley Water District v. The Superior Court; Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Coachella Valley Water District filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sykes, Sunshine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8325

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sykes, Sunshine

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Coachella Valley Water District

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael G. Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101-2109

Pamela Kentos Graham

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101-2109

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

790 E. Colorado Boulevard, Suite 850

Pasadena, CA 91101-2109

Interested Party Attorneys

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 450

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Sara Marie McDuffie

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 450

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Attorney at Costell & Adelson Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 450

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: and application for stay, denied (dtd Mar 4, 2022). Request for judicial notice granted. S273383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: by petitioner; S273383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: and request for immediate stay denied. Slough McKinster Raphael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by RPI to petitoner's motion for immediate stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: RPI re: will be filing an opposition to petitioner's request for immediate stay, no later than Feb 24, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.; Notes: by petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: by petitioner, in support of reply to preliminary opposition to writ petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: preliminary opposition to writ petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: by RPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: RPI's request for judicial notice - chronological index entitled logical index, missing bookmark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: RPI'S Req for judicial ntc - must comply with MISC. Order 19-16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: petition by RPI Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee by RPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 volume (corrected)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 1 volume (32 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: 1 volume of exhibits - pagination, missing table of contents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: 4 vols

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less