This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/04/2022 at 03:02:52 (UTC).

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT v. S.C. (ROBERTS)

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT filed an Other lawsuit against C ROBERTS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8243

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Coachella Valley Water District

County of Riverside

Respondent

Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Randall C. Roberts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Liliane Marie Wyckoff

Pamela Kentos Graham

Michael G. Colantuono

Interested Party Attorneys

Jeffrey Lee Costell

Joshua Stewart Stambaugh

Sara Marie McDuffie

Timothy J. Burke

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied; Notes: The requests for judicial notice are granted. The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing depublication of the opinion is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including July 14, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Randall C. Roberts Attorney: Jeffrey Lee Costell Opposition to the Judicial Notice filed on 5/5/21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Real Party in Interest's reply in support of motion for judicial notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Randall C. Roberts Attorney: Jeffrey Lee Costell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Coachella Valley Water District, Petitioner Michael G. Colantuono, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Real Party in Interest: Randall C. Roberts Attorney: Jeffrey Lee Costell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Petitioner: Coachella Valley Water District Attorney: Pamela Kentos Graham Petitioner: County of Riverside Attorney: Pamela Kentos Graham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Coachella Valley Water District Attorney: Pamela Kentos Graham Petitioner: County of Riverside Attorney: Pamela Kentos Graham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Coachella Valley Water District Attorney: Pamela Kentos Graham Petitioner: County of Riverside Attorney: Pamela Kentos Graham Opposition to motion for judicial notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Randall C. Roberts Attorney: Jeffrey Lee Costell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Randall C. Roberts Attorney: Jeffrey Lee Costell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E074010; Disposition: Petition granted after order to show cause issued; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1825310

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less