This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/17/2023 at 09:56:47 (UTC).

Clear Recon Corp v. 18724 Vicci Street Canyon Country, CA 91351

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Clear Recon Corp filed an Other lawsuit against 18724 Vicci Street Canyon Country, CA 91351. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandvig, Melvin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1300

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sandvig, Melvin

 

Party Details

Respondents and Petitioners

Clear Recon Corp

18724 Vicci Street Canyon Country, CA 91351

California Bank & Trust, N.A.

United States of America

Zions Bancorporation N.A.

Lloyd R. Anastasi

Appellant

RHI/WWW LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Fred T. Winters

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

4375 Jutland Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92117

Thomas Richard Phinney

Attorney at Parkinson Phinney

3600 American River Dr Ste 145

Sacramento, CA 95864

Donna Taylor Parkinson

Attorney at Parkinson Phinney

3600 American River Drive Suite 145

Sacramento, CA 95864

Jeremy Burkhardt

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

300 N. Los Angeles Street Room 7211-70

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Michael F. Sisson

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael F. Sisson

3655 Torrance Blvd. 3Rd Floor

Torrance, CA 90501

Appellant Attorneys

Steven Frederick Kuehl

Attorney at Boren, Osher & Luftman

222 N Pacific Coast Hwy Ste 2222

El Segundo, CA 90245

Stephen Zachary Boren

Attorney at Boren, Osher & Luftman, LLP

222 North Pacific Coast Highway Suite 2222

El Segundo, CA 90245

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Appellant RHI/WWW LP having filed a request for dismissal of appeal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal in the above-entitled action is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Appellant RHI/WWW LP having filed a request for dismissal of appeal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal in the above-entitled action is dismissed. Remittitur to issue forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Abandonment form cannot be used. Counsel must file a request for dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: RHI/WWW LP Attorney: Steven Frederick Kuehl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: RHI/WWW LPAttorney: Steven Frederick Kuehl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Case information statement rejected via TrueFiling. Judgment and/or appealable order was not provided.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Paid via CC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellant's notice filed 2/11/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 2/1/2021 by RHI/WWW LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CHCP00155; Trial Court Judge: Sandvig, Melvin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RHI/WWW LP is a litigant

Latest cases where ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST FKA ZB N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATE OF AMERICAN is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant