This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/20/2022 at 18:05:44 (UTC).

Clean Up America, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Clean Up America, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mackey, Malcolm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9851

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mackey, Malcolm

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Deontay Potter

Clean Up America, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Malcolm H. Mackey

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Environmental & Chemical Consulting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Dale L. Gronemeier

Attorney at Gronemeier & Associates

1490 Colorado Blvd.

Eagle Rock, CA 90041

Elbie J. Hickambottom

Attorney at Gronemeier & Associates, PC

1490 Colorado Blvd

Eagle Rock, CA 90041

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Evgeny Swarovski

Attorney at Swarovski Law

Po Box 1583

Running Springs, CA 92382-1583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed January 13, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: certificate of interested persons filed by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION DBA ECC REMEDIATION SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEAN UP AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWAROVSKI, EVGENY