This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/06/2021 at 02:47:47 (UTC).

Clark v. Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Clark filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Krueger, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2802

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Third Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Krueger, Christopher

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Michael Clark

Corcoran, CA 93212

Respondent and Defendant

Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Lucas Loren Hennes

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

1300 I Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Misha D. Igra

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 95244-2550

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 2/19/21, designating CT only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to reinstate the appeal is granted. The order filed December 10, 2020, dismissing the appeal is vacated, and the appeal is reinstated. The clerk of the superior court is directed to treat the appeal as including a designation of the clerk's transcript only. RAYE, P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to reinstate the appeal with proposed designation of record (with permission).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: appellant Michael Clark old address: California State Prison, Corcoran, P.O. Box 8800, Corcoran, CA 93212 new address: 3043 Placer Street, Redding, CA 96001 Pursuant to appellant's written notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Vacated per order dated 2/18/2021. The trial court notified this court that the appellant failed to properly designate the reporter's transcript as required by rule 8.121(b)(A) and 8.130(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court and failed to deposit the court reporter's fee for the preparation of the reporter's transcript as required by rule 8.130(b)(3) of the California Rules of Court, or in the alternative, failed to provide a notice of intent to proceed without a reporter's transcript as required by rule 8.130(a)(1) of the California Rules of Court. Therefore, the appeal filed on September 28, 2020, is dismissed. RAYE, P.J., ROBIE, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Failed to properly designate the RT and deposit the court reporter's fee or provide notice of intent to proceed with the RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant. Receipt #R324589.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: Appellant inquiring about status of filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Attorney General updating assigned attorney's information. Misha D. Igra, State Bar No. 208711 Supervising Deputy Attorney General Office of the Attorney General 1300 I Street, Suite 125 P.O. Box 944255 Sacramento, CA 94244-2550 Telephone: (916) 210-7339 Facsimile: (916) 324-5205 E-mail: Misha.Igra@doj.ca.gov

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Filing fee or application due: 11/16/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: MAURO, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: Due: 10/30/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 09/28/20 with designation attached. Designating CT only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34201900252706CUPOGDS; Trial Court Judge: Krueger, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucas Loren Hennes