This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/21/2022 at 13:07:41 (UTC).

City of Vallejo v. Superior Court for the County of Solano

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 City of Vallejo filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Solano. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gutierrez, Carlos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5091

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gutierrez, Carlos

 

Party Details

Petitioner

City of Vallejo

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Solano

Interested Party

Nick Esco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Veronica Ann Franz Nebb

Attorney at City Attorney, City of Vallejo

555 Santa Clara St

Vallejo, CA 94590

Kristoffer James Jacob

Attorney at Deputy City Attorney

City Of Vallejo 555 Santa Clara Street, 3Rd Floor

Vallejo, CA 94590

Christine M De Leo

Attorney at Solano County District Attorney

675 Texas St Unite 4500

Fairfield, CA 94533

Interested Party Attorney

Angelica Ona Leonardo

Attorney at Solano County Alternate Defender

675 Texas St Ste 3600

Fairfield, CA 94533-6339

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The request for immediate stay and petition for writ of mandate are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The request for immediate stay and petition for writ of mandate are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to writ petition showing service on Hon. Carlos R. Gutierrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate *** Unredacted - May Not Be Examined Without Court Order ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Petitioner - video

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: of Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: of Application to File Petition Under Seal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: "Manual Filing Notification"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: City Attorney's Office stating the following:"Dear Clerk of the Court: On May 2, 2022, the City of Vallejo filed electronically a Petition for Writ of Mandate, Application o File Petition for Writ of Mandate, Declaration of Kristoffer S. Jacob Under Seal, Along with a Public Redacted Version." and "Enclosed you will find the confidential materials and exhibits in the above matter, which was assigned the temporary case number above."Clerk's Note: May be copy of letter accompanying manual submission of exhibits at the counter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Application to File Petition for Writ of Mandate and Declaration of Kristoffer S. Jacob Under Seal, Along With a Public Redacted Version May Not Be Examined Without Court Order-Contains material from conditionally sealed record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate - Immediate Stay Requested May Not Be Examined Without Court Order-Contains material from conditionally sealed record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Solano County Superior Court - Main; County: Solano; Trial Court Case Number: VCR237990; Trial Court Judge: Gutierrez, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Vallejo is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Solano is a litigant