This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/06/2022 at 01:49:50 (UTC).

City of San Jose v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 City of San Jose filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5568

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

City of San Jose

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Nora Frimann

Attorney at Office of The City Attorney City of San Jose

200 E Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Kendra Elizabeth McGee

Attorney at Office of City Attorney

200 E Santa Clara St 16Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Benjamin Ardell Johnson, Jr

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 East Santa Clara Street, 16Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Christian Bayard Nielsen

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

City Of San Jose 200 E Santa Clara St

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Interested Party Attorneys

David Riera Ruiz

Attorney at Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester

801 S Figueroa St Fl 15

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sophie Lafranchi

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

One California Street, Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Reply filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: (w/bookmarks and POS on superior court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: (no bookmarks or pos on superior court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Due on 10/03/2022 By 18 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Requested for 10/03/2022 By 18 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: oppo due 9/15; reply due 9/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Petitioner's proof of service to San Francisco Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 3 of 3 (AA000389-AA000523)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2 of 3 (AA000201-AA000388)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1 of 3 (AA000001-AA000200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, or Alternatively Writ of Prohibition (RE: May 5, 2022 order overruling demurrer to Uber?s Cross-Complaint and further proceedings thereon in underlying action).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20587444; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SAN JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUIZ DAVID RIERA ESQ.