This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/22/2022 at 02:02:01 (UTC).

Santa Rita Union School District et al. v. City of Salinas et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Santa Rita Union School District filed an Other lawsuit against City of Salinas. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, Marla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9854

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Anderson, Marla

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

City of Salinas Santa Rita Union School District

Salinas Union High School

Santa Rita Union School District

Defendants and Appellants

City of Salinas

Rexford Title, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Sloan Robert Simmons

Attorney at Lozano Smith

1 Capitol Mall Ste 640 Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Michael Robert Linden

Attorney at Lozano Smith

7404 N Spalding Ave

Fresno, CA 93720-3370

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Andrea Alessandra Matarazzo

Attorney at Pioneer Law Group LLP

1122 S St, Sacramento

Sacramento, CA 95811

Christopher Alan Callihan

200 Lincoln Ave

Salinas, CA 93901

Kathryn Lynn Patterson

Attorney at Pioneer Law Group

1122 S St

Sacramento, CA 95811-6525

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Administrative record returned to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: The above entitled appeal has been accepted into the Court's Mediation Program. (Ct. App., Sixth Dist., Local Rules, rule 1, Mediation) All further proceedings, including the filing of briefs, are hereby suspended for 90 days from the date of this order to allow the parties to participate in mediation. (Ct. App., Sixth Dist., Local Rules, rule 1, subd. (e)(7), General Mediation Program Procedure.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The augmented or corrected record on appeal in this case was filed today.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: CT-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Ntc. of omission of designated portion of the record submitted by Rexford Title.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The reporter's transcript on appeal in this case was filed on May 10, 2022. The opening brief and appendix are due in 40 days (rule 8.212(a)(1)(A), California Rules of Court). In referring to this appeal, please use the case number shown above.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Having considered appellants' response, the order to show cause issued April 28, 2022 is discharged. The appeal shall proceed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Rexford Title, Inc. Attorney: Andrea Alessandra Matarazzo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Rexford Title, Inc.Attorney: Andrea Alessandra Matarazzo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: Appellants are hereby ordered to show cause by letter brief filed no later than 15 days from the date of this order why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely from the June 23, 2021 order granting the petition for peremptory writ of mandate and request for declaratory and injunctive relief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Filed by A. Matarazzo with judgment filed on 1/18/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Your submitted filing has been rejected. You must attach to this form a copy of the judgment or order being appealed that shows the date it was entered (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104 for definition of "entered"). A copy of this form must also be served on the other party or parties to this appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Notice of transmittal from Monterey that records were sent by TAP on 3/16/21. (these records were returned no pagination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: City of Salinas, Filed 2/8/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Monterey County Superior Court; County: Monterey; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV000242; Trial Court Judge: Anderson, Marla

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rexford Title, Inc. is a litigant