This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/12/2021 at 00:20:11 (UTC).

City of Oakland v. The Oakland Raiders et al.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 City of Oakland filed an Other lawsuit against The Oakland Raiders. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karlan, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3388

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karlan, Craig

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

City of Oakland

Respondents and Defendants

The Oakland Raiders, et al.

Arizona Cardinals Football Club LLC

Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC

Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership

Buffalo Bills, LLC

Panthers Football, LLC

The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc.

Cincinnati Bengals, Inc.

Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC

Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd.

PDB Sports, Ltd.

The Detroit Lions, Inc.

Green Bay Packers, Inc.

Houston NFL Holdings LP

Indianapolis Colts, Inc.

Jacksonville Jaguars, LLC

Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.

Chargers Football Company, LLC

The Rams Football Company, LLC

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Clifford Harris Pearson

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw LLP

15165 Ventura Blvd Suite 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Daniel L. Warshaw

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw

15165 Ventura Blvd., Suite 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Michael Harrison Pearson

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Blvd Ste 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-3373

Thomas J. Nolan

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Blvd, Ste 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Matthew A. Pearson

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Blvd Ste 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Barbara Jean Parker

Attorney at Office of Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank H Ogawa Plz Fl 6

Oakland, CA 94612

Maria Susan Bee

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1 Frank H. Ogawa Plz Fl 6

Oakland, CA 94612

Malia J. McPherson

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank H Ogawa Plaza 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Steven L. Mayer

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3 Embarcadero Center 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kenneth Gibbs Hausman

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3 Embarcadero Center 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

David James Reis

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3 Embarcadero Center 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Daniel Brian Asimow

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3 Embarcadero Ctr 10Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (817 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 22, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: City of Oakland Attorney: Clifford Harris Pearson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 11/10/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: City of OaklandAttorney: Barbara Jean Parker Attorney: Clifford Harris Pearson Attorney: Daniel L. Warshaw Attorney: Malia J. McPherson Attorney: Maria Susan Bee Attorney: Matthew A. Pearson Attorney: Michael Harrison Pearson Attorney: Thomas J. Nolan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: City of OaklandAttorney: Clifford Harris Pearson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Warshaw, Daniel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on 06/14/2021 by City of Oakland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV20676; Trial Court Judge: Karlan, Craig

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC is a litigant