This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/26/2023 at 23:01:46 (UTC).

City of Los Angeles et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 City of Los Angeles filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Orozco, Yolanda. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4033

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Orozco, Yolanda

 

Party Details

Petitioners

City of Los Angeles

Charles Garcia

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Yolanda Orozco

Interested Parties

Estate of Alejandro Valencia Mendez

Alejandro Valencia Linares

Alejandrina Valencia Linares

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Christian Richard Bojorquez

200 North Main Street 16Th Fl, City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012

James P. Clark

Attorney at City Of Los Angeles

200 N Main St 6Th Fl, City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4133

Michael N. Feuer

Attorney at Los Angeles City Attorney's Office

200 N. Main Street 6Th Fl, City Hall East

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Krista MacNevin Jee

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 N. Harbor Blvd.

Fullerton, CA 92835

James R. Touchstone

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 N. Harbor Blvd.

Fullerton, CA 92835

Denise Lynn Rocawich

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 N. Harbor Blvd.

Fullerton, CA 92835

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 31

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Sarah Marie Brockett

Attorney at Law Offices of Sarah M. Brockett

3990 Old Town Ave Ste 202A

San Diego, CA 92110-2905

Eugene Gerald Iredale

Attorney at Iredale and Yoo APC

105 W F St, Fl 4

San Diego, CA 92101

Julia Yoo

Attorney at Iredale and Yoo APC

105 W F St Fl 4

San Diego, CA 92101-6087

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate, filed October 21, 2022, and the notice of lodging audio and video exhibits in support of petition and the USB flash-drive containing the audio and video exhibits, filed October 25, 2022, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate, filed October 21, 2022, and the notice of lodging audio and video exhibits in support of petition and the USB flash-drive containing the audio and video exhibits, filed October 25, 2022, have been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Frederick Bennett old email 1: fbennett@lacourt.org new email 1: courtcounselwrits@lacourt.org old email 2: PNguyen1@lacourt.org; LGershon@LACourt.org new email 2: {blank}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of Lodging Audio and Video Exhibits in support of Petition for Writ of Mandate.(USB flash-drive included)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume S. Sealed by Order of the court on October 12, 2022.*SEALED*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Three (3) volumes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate; Memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brockett, Sarah M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yoo, Julia