This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/11/2023 at 05:05:01 (UTC).

City of Half Moon Bay v. Granada Sanitary District et al.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 City of Half Moon Bay filed an Other lawsuit against Granada Sanitary District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9896

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rudy, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

City of Half Moon Bay

Respondents and Defendants

Granada Community Services District

Montara Water and Sanitary District

Sewer Authority Mid-Coastline

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Pamela Kentos Graham

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

420 Sierra College Drive, Suite 140

Grass Valley, CA 95945-2109

Michael George Colantuono

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

420 Sierra College Drive, Suite 140

Grass Valley, CA 95945

Vernetra L. Gavin

Attorney at Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC

420 Sierra College Drive, Suite 140

Grass Valley, CA 95945

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Antoinette Ponce Ranit

Attorney at Wittwer Parkin LLP

335 Spreckels Drive, Suite H

Aptos, CA 95003

William P. Parkin

Attorney at Wittwer Parkin LLP

335 Spreckels Drive, Suite H

Aptos, CA 95003

Thomas P. Murphy

Attorney at Berliner Cohen LLP

10 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 1100

San Jose, CA 95113

Christine Carin Fitzgerald

Attorney at Fitzgerald Law Offices

P.O. Box 1366

Burlingame, CA 94011

Jolie Houston

Attorney at Berliner Cohen

10 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 1100

San Jose, CA 95113-2233

Jeremy Nathan Jungreis

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Ruling on appellant's supplemental motion for judicial notice is deferred for consideration with the merits of the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition of respondent Montara Water and Sanitary District to supplemental motion for judicial notice in support of appellant's reply brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition of respondent Granada Community Services District to supplemental motion for judicial notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Supplemental motion for judicial notice in support of appellant's reply brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: City of Half Moon Bay Attorney: Pamela Kentos Graham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: City of Half Moon BayAttorney: Pamela Kentos Graham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: 3rd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: 2nd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Per stipulation filed on 9/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appellant having failed to procure the record on appeal within the time limits allowed or within any valid extensions of these time limits, and having further failed to apply to this court for relief from default, the appeal filed on March 18, 2022, is dismissed. (See rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Appellant's non-compliance file don 4/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Filed in Superior Court on 3/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Filed by Pamela K. Graham with judgment of March 2, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Your submitted filing has been rejected. You must attach to this form a copy of the judgment or order being appealed that shows the date it was entered (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104 for definition of "entered").

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Dear Clerk of the Court: We are in receipt of the notice of non-payment of the filing fee in the above referenced case. Our office represents the City of Half Moon Bay in this matter. The City is a public agency exempt from filing fees under Government Code section 6103. If you have any questions, please do not hesitate to contact us.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: City of Half Moon Bay, filed 3/18/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 17CV316927; Trial Court Judge: Rudy, Christopher

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less