Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/03/2021 at 00:35:52 (UTC).

City of Costa Mesa et al. v. Raw Recovery, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 City of Costa Mesa filed an Other lawsuit against Raw Recovery, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gooding, Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9944

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gooding, Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

The People of the State of California

City of Costa Mesa

Defendants and Appellants

Raw Recovery, LLC

Daniel Loyer

Douglas Allenthorpe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Kimberly Hall Barlow

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 N. Harbor Blvd

Fullerton, CA 92835

Seymour Bernard Everett, III

Attorney at Everett Dorey LLP

18300 Von Karman Ave Ste 900

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Isaac R. Zfaty

Attorney at Much Shelist, PC

660 Newport Center Dr Ste 900

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Garrett Michael Prybylo

Attorney at Much Shelist PC

660 Newport Center Dr Ste 900

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6414

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR/ J. Hong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 3/08/2021. Appellant elects to proceed by rule 8.122 CT & RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid By APLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts: Raw Recovery, LLC et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01100863; Trial Court Judge: Gooding, Martha

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Costa Mesa is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARLOW KIMBERLY HALL