Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/24/2021 at 07:24:17 (UTC).

City of Costa Mesa et al. v. Pacific Shores Recovery, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 City of Costa Mesa filed an Other lawsuit against Pacific Shores Recovery, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Griffin, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9571

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Griffin, Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

The People of the State of California

City of Costa Mesa

Defendants and Appellants

Alice Conner

Pacific Shores Recovery, LLC

Mark C. Manderson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Kimberly Hall Barlow

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 N. Harbor Blvd

Fullerton, CA 92835

Seymour Bernard Everett, III

Attorney at Everett Dorey LLP

18300 Von Karman Ave Ste 900

Irvine, CA 92612

Bruce A. Lindsay

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 N Harbor Blvd

Fullerton, CA 92835

Christopher David Lee

Attorney at Everett Dorey LLP

18300 Von Karman Ave Ste 900

Irvine, CA 92612-1054

Samantha Elizabeth Dorey

Attorney at Everett Dorey LLP

One Macarthur Pl., Suite 110

Santa Ana, CA 92707-5938

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Garrett Michael Prybylo

Attorney at Much Shelist PC

660 Newport Center Dr Ste 900

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6414

Isaac R. Zfaty

Attorney at Much Shelist, PC

660 Newport Center Dr Ste 900

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Christopher Arnold Brancart

Attorney at Brancart & Brancart

P O Box 686

Pescadero, CA 94060

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/09/2021 By 60 Day(s) 60 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Stip ext form is requesting an RB/X-AOB ext, instead of an AOB ext.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 1 CT (294 pages) and 1 RT (15 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/05/20 (8.122 CT & RT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts: Pacific Shores Recovery, LLC et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01100581; Trial Court Judge: Griffin, Craig

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Costa Mesa is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Elizabeth Dorey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARLOW KIMBERLY HALL