This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/29/2021 at 10:45:15 (UTC).

Cisneros et al. v. Department of Motor Vehicles, as an Agency of the State of California et al.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Cisneros filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Motor Vehicles, as an Agency of the State of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bradshaw, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1373

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bradshaw, Eric

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Granados

Becarra

Miller

Datiz

Almanza

Klein

Gabriela Cisneros

Alejandre

Owen

D. Gonzalez

Lopez Vega

Bennett

Jimenez

Hawkins

Blanche

Martinez

J. Perales

Lynam

Respondents and Defendants

Cosper

Department of Motor Vehicles, as an Agency of the State of California

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Plaintiff, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Richard O. Middlebrook

Attorney at Middlebrook & Brehmer, LLP

8501 Brimhall Rd, Ste 404

Bakersfield, CA 93312

Bradley William Parr

Attorney at Deputy Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: F081372; ALL FUTURE ENTRIES WILL BE IN THAT CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: atty Richard O Middlebrook for petitioner Cisneros et al with Immediate Stay requested re: license suspensions by DMV.SEE LEAD CASE FOR FOLLOW-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: refund requested in On Base for $775 filing fee on petition for writ of supersedeas . (fee already paid with Notice of Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Atty Middlebrook obo Cisneros et al. (Drivers); pursuant to court order of 8/17/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Receipt for Records for Register of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Petition for Writ of Supersedeas rejected in On Base for Local Rule 8 defects (Needs Electronic Book marks for Table of contents on petition and its headings , needs Electronic Bookmarks for Table of Contents of Exhibits ; Page numbers must be consecutive for the entire document (cover as page 1 through page 542) page number citations will need to be adjusted on table of contents after pagination is corrected) need writ petition information sheet .notified by tcw Reagan at atty Middlebrook's office this date .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has reviewed the Department of Motor Vehicles' August 10, 2020 letter requesting that these appeals be decided in two stages and that a briefing schedule be established for the first stage. The court is inclined to adopt procedures that will promote the efficient resolution of these appeals and seeks the input from drivers' counsel on the DMV's proposal. Specifically, counsel is directed to address the following points. 1. Do drivers support or oppose proceeding with the appeals in case Nos. F081372 and F081373 in two stages, the first of which would be limited to the legal question of whether Government Code section 11524, subdivision (c) is applicable to administrative per se hearings conducted by the DMV pursuant to Vehicle Code section 14100, et seq.? 2. Assuming the court adopts the two-stage procedure, what is the drivers' position on the following: (a) The briefing schedule proposed by the DMV. (b) Should the first stage be granted a calendar preference (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.240)? (c) Should the two appeals be consolidated for purposes of the first stage, the second stage, or both? (d) Should the record on appeal be prepared in two stages-that is, would it be cost and time efficient to delay preparing the full record until after the first stage is decided? (e) If the appeals are not consolidated, should the court, on its own motion in each appeal, take judicial notice of the appellate record, briefing and orders filed in the other appeal? (f) Should counsel be directed to meet and confer to discuss the foregoing points and determine if some or all can be resolved by agreement? 3. Assuming a meet and confer is ordered and does not result in an agreement among the parties, should a case management conference be held by this court? (Note: If a case management conference is held by this court, it is likely the conference would be conducted by video conference in a manner similar to the mediation of a civil appeal under Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2, with the parties being required to submit a statement of the issues they believe should be addressed at the conference and their position on those issues. However, disqualification of the Justice conducting the conference would occur only if requested by a party, as the conference is unlikely to result in the disclosure of confidential information to the Justice.) Counsel for the drivers is directed to submit a letter responding to these points on or before Monday, August 24, 2020. The court would appreciate the responses being labeled with the numbers and letters used in this order. Counsel's letter may raise other points and make suggestions regarding the handling of the appeals. Clerk's Transcript. Preparation of the clerk's transcript pursuant to appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in case No. F081373 is temporarily stayed pending further order of this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Proposed briefing sequence filed by:; Notes: DAG Parr pursuant to rule 8.216 obo Respondent Department of Motor Vehicles et al...filed 8/11/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Receipt for Records for Register of Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100778

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100557

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100780

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100295

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-19-100294; Trial Court Judge: Bradshaw, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Granados is a litigant

Latest cases where Hawkins is a litigant

Latest cases where Dr. Bennett is a litigant