This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/10/2023 at 04:28:58 (UTC).

Cihak v. Gorgani

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 Cihak filed an Other lawsuit against Gorgani. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Longstreth, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1729

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Longstreth, Robert

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

John F. Cihak

Appellant and Defendant

Kaveh Gorgani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

William J. Freed

Rodney Lee Donohoo

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

David Gerald Greco

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kaveh Gorgani Attorney: David Gerald Greco 11 volumes of appendix (2,828 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Due Date: 09/28/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: John F. CihakAttorney: Rodney Lee Donohoo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kaveh GorganiAttorney: David Gerald Greco; Notes: 11 volumes of appendix (2,828 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Granted in part Last extension

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: RT-2 (103 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 3/17/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 3/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 3/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 2/27/23 by KAVEH MICHAEL GORGANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019-00063756-CU-NP-CTL; Trial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019-00012669-PR-LS-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Longstreth, Robert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less