This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/23/2021 at 21:55:07 (UTC).

Cicinelli v. City of Fullerton et al.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Cicinelli filed an Other lawsuit against City of Fullerton. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hoffer, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9875

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hoffer, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Jay Cicinelli

Whittier, CA 90604

Respondents and Defendants

City Council of the city of Fullerton

City of Fullerton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Timothy Keith Talbot

2300 Contra Costa Blvd Ste 500

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523-3973

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly Hall Barlow

Attorney at Jones & Mayer

3777 N. Harbor Blvd

Fullerton, CA 92835

J Scott Tiedemann

Attorney at Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

6033 W Century Blvd, 5Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents scanned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Parties re opposition to motions to dismiss due by 03/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Original default notice was not sent to appellant who is in pro per. Second notice was sent to appellant through True Filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: by resp Fullerton City Council

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: by resp City of Fullerton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By aplt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLT: Jay Cicinelli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2017-00923829; Trial Court Judge: Hoffer, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Fullerton is a litigant