This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/26/2023 at 03:12:53 (UTC).

Christensen et al. v. First American Title Company

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Christensen filed an Other lawsuit against First American Title Company. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Spain, Julia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6796

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Spain, Julia

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Susan M. Christensen

Andrew J. Christensen

Defendant and Respondent

First American Title Company

Others

Benjamin Blair

Gabrielle Stanley Blair

Compass California II Inc.

Kenneth Er

Dinh Truong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Joe Christensen

Attorney at Law Office of Andrew J. Christensen, P.C.

1970 Broadway Ste 550

Oakland, CA 94612-2203

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Michael Thomas Fogarty

Attorney at Boutin Jones Inc.

555 Capitol Mall - Suite 1500

Sacramento, CA 95814-4692

Michael Eric Chase

Attorney at Boutin Jones Inc.

555 Capitol Mall - Suite 1500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Other Attorneys

Donald Armstrong Odell

Attorney at The Estavillo Law Group

426 17Th Street, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Jason W. Estavillo

Attorney at Estavillo Law Group

426 17Th Street, Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Brian Slome

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street - Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/12/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 06/12/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: vol. 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Susan M. Christensen Attorney: Andrew Joe Christensen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: appellant's appendix; Appendix concurrently submitted with the compliant brief was filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: opening brief; 1. missing descriptive electronic bookmarks (CRC 8.74(a)(3).) 2. missing service on superior court (CRC 8.212(c)(1).) Please file a compliant brief by 4:00 p.m. today, March 14. Otherwise, the appendix will also be rejected.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/12/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: First American Title CompanyAttorney: Michael Thomas Fogarty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Susan M. ChristensenAttorney: Andrew Joe Christensen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: all counsel; record on appeal filed, AOB due in 40 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 1/27/22; appendix and reporter's transcript (attached to designation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: Jan. 11, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1104, Law Office of Andrew J. Christensen, P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Susan M. Christensen Attorney: Andrew Joe Christensen Benjamin Blair et al. and Compass California et al. are not parties in this appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: civil case information statement; Please list both appellate and trial court designations for the parties participating in this appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Susan M. ChristensenAttorney: Andrew Joe Christensen; Notes: Benjamin Blair et al. and Compass California et al. are not parties in this appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/16/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiff Susan and Andrew Christensen appealing judgment from 10/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: 22CV005893; Trial Court Judge: Spain, Julia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less