This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/02/2022 at 05:07:08 (UTC).

Chino Basin Municipal Water District et al. v. Overlying (Agricultural) Pool

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 Chino Basin Municipal Water District filed an Other lawsuit against Overlying Agricultural Pool. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Reichert, Stanford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8377

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Reichert, Stanford

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Chino Basin Municipal Water District

California Steel Industries

Cucamonga Valley Water District

City of Ontario

City of Pomona

Monte Vista Water District and Monte Vista Irrigation Co.

Jurupa Community Services District

City of Chino Hills

City of Upland

Three Valley Municipal Water District

Appellant and Defendant

Overlying (Agricultural) Pool

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jean Martin Cihigoyenetche

Attorney at JC Law Firm

5871 Pine Ave Ste 200

Chino Hills, CA 91709-6545

John Tinley Brooks

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Gene Tanaka

Attorney at Best, Best & Krieger

2001 N. Main Street, Suite 390

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Frederic A. Fudacz

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

777 S. Figueroa Street, 34Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas Simms Bunn, III

Attorney at Lagerlof, Senecal, Gosney & Kruse, LLP

301 N. Lake Avenue, 11Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101

Arthur Grant Kidman

Attorney at Kidman Law Group

2030 Main Street, Suite 1300

Irvine, CA 92614

Robert Edward Donlan

Attorney at Ellison Schneider & Harris LLP

2600 Capitol Ave Ste 400

Sacramento, CA 95816-5905

Mark Darin Hensley

Attorney at Hensley Law Group

1230 Rosecrans Avenue #110

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Kyle H. Brochard

Attorney at Richards, Watson & Gershon

350 South Grand Ave, 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3101

Steven Ralph Kennedy

201 Mountain Park Blvd Sw Apt G102

Issaquah, WA 98027

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Tracy Jane Egoscue

Attorney at Egoscue Law Group

3834 Pine Ave

Long Beach, CA 90807

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: dtd Jan 24, 2022 (City of Ontario)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Amended 8.124 notice from superior court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellant, dtd Jan 14, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jan 4, 2022; Overlying (Agricultural) Pool

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: RCVRS51010; Trial Court Judge: Reichert, Stanford

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chino Basin Municipal Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CITY OF UPLAND is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant