This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/11/2021 at 10:53:27 (UTC).

CHINESE THEATRES v. COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 CHINESE THEATRES filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6826

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Chinese Theatres, LLC

Appellant and Defendant

County of Los Angeles

Not Yet Classified

Greenberg Traurig LLP

Robert R. Rubin

Sacramento, CA 95814

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Charles Stephen Davis

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

18565 Jamboree Raod, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92612

Colin W Fraser

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92612

Robert R. Rubin

Attorney at Boutin Jones, Inc.

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 950

Sacramento, CA 95814

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Kevin Slattery

Attorney at Lamb & Kawakami LLP

333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas George Kelch

Attorney at Lamb and Kawakami

333 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1501

Thomas Reed Parker

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

500 West Temple Street, Room 648

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Drew Michael Taylor

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles County Counsel

500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3198

Nicole Davis-Tinkham

Attorney at County Counsel Los Angeles County

Richard Enrique Girgado

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Depublication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Depublication request denied (case closed); Notes: The requests for an order directing depublication of the opinion in the above-entitled matter are denied. The court declines to review this matter on its own motion. The matter is now final.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (depublication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time for ordering review extended on the court's own motion; Notes: The time for ordering review on the court's own motion is hereby extended to and including May 4, 2021. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(c).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Robert R. Rubin Attorney: Robert R. Rubin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: County of Los Angeles, Defendant and Appellant Michael K. Slattery, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication filed (initial case event); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Greenberg Traurig LLP Attorney: Charles Stephen Davis ** Opinion published January 4, 2021 **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: premature depublicationGreenberg Traurig LLP, Pub/Depublication Requestor Charles Stephen Davis, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302708; Disposition: Reversed in Full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC687084

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHINESE THEATRE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant