This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/15/2021 at 02:27:31 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. E.T.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against E T. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Mary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8231

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kelly, Mary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

E. T.

Others

Hon. Mary E. Kelly

D. O.

Not Yet Classified

J. T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Office of County Counsel

Attorney at Office of the County Counel - Appeals Division

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jane Eunjung Kwon

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

648 Kenneth Hahn Hall Of Administration 500 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen B. Stalter

P. O. Box 12381

La Crescenta, CA 91224

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chaena B. Dade

101 Centre Plaza Dr

Monterey Park, CA 91754-2155

Other Attorneys

Karmena J Diggs

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas Hayes

901 Corporate Center Drive Suite 406

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7693

Karmena J Pleasant

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas Hayes

901 Corporate Center Drive Suite 406

Monterey Park, CA 91754-7693

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingDescription: Calendar notice returned with proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Respondent's counsel notice of change address (effective April 1, 2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: May 4, 2021 at 9 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: E. T. Attorney: Karen B. Stalter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: E. T.Attorney: Karen B. Stalter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Children and Family Services Attorney: Jane Eunjung Kwon One extension granted for a total of 38 days: 02/05/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/15/2021 By 38 Day(s) 02/05/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/15/2021 By 38 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Children and Family ServicesAttorney: Jane Eunjung Kwon; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 38 days: 02/05/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/15/2021 By 38 Day(s) 02/05/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/15/2021 By 38 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: E. T. Attorney: Karen B. Stalter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: E. T.Attorney: Karen B. Stalter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (270 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 10/15/20 E.T. (father) 20CCJP02550A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP02550; Trial Court Judge: Kelly, Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20CCJP02550A; Trial Court Judge: Kelly, Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karmena J Pleasant