This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/16/2023 at 02:47:32 (UTC).

Chidester et al. v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Chidester filed an Other lawsuit against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2192

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Cynthia Sabrina Chidester

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

Nita Chidester

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

Respondents and Defendants

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

The Bank of New York Mellon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Justin Donald Balser

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Appellants motion to vacate dismissal, reinstate the appeal, and be relived from default is GRANTED. The order of dismissal is VACATED and the appeal is REINSTATED. Appellants Civil Case Information Statement shall be filed no later than 15 days from the filing of this order. Orange County Superior Court, Appellate Division is directed to proceed with the preparation of the record on appeal.Copy of order mailed to appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: aplts' mtn to vacate dismissal and reinstate appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: By aplts.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: Appellants failed to file a Civil Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g), after notice that appellants were in default. Accordingly, the appeal is DISMISSED. Appellants are advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.Copy of order mailed to appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Dismissal order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Copy mailed to appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: as to both appellants; copy mailed to appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by both appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Copy mailed to both appellants.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: By appellants Cynthia Sabrina Chidester and Nita Chidester.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Fullerton; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01158188; Trial Court Judge: Salter, Glenn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less