This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/30/2021 at 05:31:57 (UTC).

Chen v. Hershel

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 Chen filed an Other lawsuit against Hershel. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Minning, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6200

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Minning, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yijing Chen

Defendant and Appellant

Nicole Rose Hershel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Jonathan Michael Ritter

Attorney at Eldabe Ritter Trial Lawyers

1150 S Olive St Ste 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90015-3990

S Edmond ElDabe

Attorney at ElDabe Ritter Trial Lawyers

1150 S. Olive Street Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90015

Dana I. Castruita

Attorney at ElDabe Ritter Trial Lawyers

1150 S. Olive Street Ste 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90015-5216

Joshua Elliott Ritter

Attorney at Werksman Jackson Hathaway & Quinn

888 W 6Th St Fl 4

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Zareh A. Jaltorossian

Attorney at KP Law

150 East Colorado Boulevard, Ste 206

Pasadena, CA 91105

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht

Attorney at Horton, Oberrecht, Kirkpatrick & Martha

101 W. Broadway, Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

Kimberly Ilene Marcus

Attorney at Horton, Oberrecht, Kirkpatrick & Martha

101 W Broadway Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101-5011

Nadia Ann Sarkis

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP,

5900 Wilshire Blvd. 12Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Robert A. Olson

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nicole Rose Hershel Attorney: Kimberly Ilene Marcus One extension granted for a total of 61 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nicole Rose HershelAttorney: Kimberly Ilene Marcus; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 61 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Yijing Chen Attorney: Jonathan Michael Ritter One extension granted for a total of 60 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Yijing ChenAttorney: Jonathan Michael Ritter; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 60 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: an RBF was due by 6/28/21;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Plaintiff/respondent counsel Zareth A. Jaltorossian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nicole Rose Hershel Attorney: Kimberly Ilene Marcus Two extensions granted for a total of 60 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (329 Pages) R-7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: The law firm of Horton, Oberrecht, Kirkpatrick & Martha associate the law firm of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP as co-counsel of record for appellant Nicole Rose.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nicole Rose Hershel Attorney: Kimberly Ilene Marcus Attorney: Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nicole Rose HershelAttorney: Kimberly Ilene Marcus Attorney: Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on June 18, 2020 (Additional Documents)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on June 12, 2020 (8.122 w/ RT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card Nicole Rose Hershel, Defendant and Appellant Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No Fee Received for Notice of Appeal filed on June 02, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed on June 02, 2020 by Nicole Rose Hershel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC685291; Trial Court Judge: Minning, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nadia Ann Sarkis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A. Olson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE