This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/26/2021 at 10:26:16 (UTC).

CHEN v. EBAY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 CHEN filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against EBAY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1005

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Theo Chen

Edgar Amirkhanyan

Eugene Cobb

Gary George

Nazar Pailevanian

Nicole Pitteloud

Kim Bunch

Francis Jancik

John Hamisch

Nicole Jones

Tranik Enterprises, Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

Ebay, Inc.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

J. David Franklin

Attorney at Franklin & Franklin

2127 Caminito Circulo Norte

La Jolla, CA 92037

Anthony A. Ferrigno

Attorney at Law Offices of Anthony A. Ferrigno

3445 Golden Gate Way

Lafayette, CA 94549

Pamela E. Havird

Attorney at Law Offices Pamela E. Havird

P.O. Box 375

La Jolla, CA 92038

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

William P. Donovan

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3206

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Theo Chen Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Edgar Amirkhanyan Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Eugene Cobb Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Gary George Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Nazar Pailevanian Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Nicole Pitteloud Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Kim Bunch Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Francis Jancik Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: John Hamisch Attorney: J. David Franklin Plaintiff and Appellant: Nicole Jones Attorney: J. David Franklin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Theo Chen Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Edgar Amirkhanyan Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Eugene Cobb Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Gary George Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Nazar Pailevanian Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Nicole Pitteloud Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Kim Bunch Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Francis Jancik Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: John Hamisch Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno Plaintiff and Appellant: Nicole Jones Attorney: Anthony A. Ferrigno *** The Court of Appeal, 1st Appellate District provides no recommendation for the request for publication. ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A158417; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: RG15780778

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tranik Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EBAY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONOVAN WILLIAM PATRICK JR