This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/28/2022 at 00:05:34 (UTC).

CHART v. S.C. (PRELUDE FERTILITY)

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 CHART filed an Other lawsuit against C PRELUDE FERTILITY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2985

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chart Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Prelude Fertility, Inc

Pacific MSO, LLC

Joseph Conaghan

Pacific Fertility Center

Carl Herbert

Eldon D. Shriock

Philip Chenette

Carolyn Givens

Liyun Li

Isabelle Ryan

Praxair Distribution, Inc.

Praxair, Inc.

JCCP Plaintiffs Listed in Addendum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Frederic D. Cohen

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy

Business Arts Plaza 3601 West Olive Avenue, 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505-4681

Kevin Ringel

Attorney at Swanson Martin & Bell, LLP

330 North Wabash Ave., Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Stephen E. Norris

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy

3601 West Olive Avenue, 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Marc G. Cowden

Attorney at Sheuerman, Martini, Tabari, Zenere & Garvin

1033 Willow Street

San Jose, CA 95125

John J. Duffy

Attorney at Swanson Martin & Bell, LLP

330 North Wabash Ave., Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Adam Michael Stoddard

Attorney at Zenere Cowden & Stoddard APC

2005 De La Cruz Boulevard, Suite 240

Santa Clara, CA 95050-3026

Julian Wonjung Park

Attorney at HORVITZ & LEVY LLP

505 Sansome Street, Ste 375

San Francisco, CA 94111-3175

Interested Party Attorneys

David Frank McDowell

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

William Francis Tarantino

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Erin M. Bosman

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Julie Yongsun Park

Attorney at MORRISON & FOERSTER LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Aaron T. Schultz

Attorney at Galloway, Lucchese, Everson & Picchi

2300 Contra Costa Blvd. Suite 350

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Sukhwinder Kaur Bajwa

Attorney at Galloway Lucchese Everson & Picchi

1676 N. California Bouelvard - Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-4142

Joseph S. Picchi

Attorney at Galloway Lucchese Everson & Picchi

2300 Contra Costa Blvd., Suite 350

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Michael Jaeger

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael A. Kelly

Attorney at Walkup Melodia Kelly & Schoenberger

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Kathleen Hersh-Boyle

Attorney at Hersh & Hersh

601 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94102

Nancy Hersh

Attorney at Hersh & Hersh

601 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94102

Elizabeth J. Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein

275 Battery Street - 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Lexi J. Hazam

Attorney at Lieff Global, LLP

275 Battery Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

6 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Petitioner's request to file the petition for review under seal and respondent's request to file its answer under seal are granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 2.550, 8.46(d).) In ordering the sealing, this court makes the findings required by California Rules of Court, rules 2.550(d) and 8.46(d)(6). The clerk of this court is directed to file the unredacted petition for review and answer under seal. The petition for review is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including May 2, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Chart Inc. Attorney: Stephen E. Norris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Unredacted Answer to Petition for Review **May Not Be Examined Without Court Order-Contains material from conditionally sealed record.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Prelude Fertility, Inc Attorney: James R. Sigel Real Party in Interest: Pacific MSO, LLC Attorney: James R. Sigel Real Party in Interest: Joseph Conaghan Attorney: James R. Sigel Real Party in Interest: Pacific Fertility Center Attorney: Joseph S. Picchi Real Party in Interest: Carl Herbert Attorney: Joseph S. Picchi Real Party in Interest: Eldon D. Shriock Attorney: Joseph S. Picchi Real Party in Interest: Philip Chenette Attorney: Joseph S. Picchi Real Party in Interest: Carolyn Givens Attorney: Joseph S. Picchi Real Party in Interest: Liyun Li Attorney: Joseph S. Picchi Real Party in Interest: Isabelle Ryan Attorney: Joseph S. Picchi **Public-Redacts material from conditionally sealed record.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to file document under seal filed; Notes: Motion to File Answer Under Seal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: UNREDACTED Petition for Review **Conditionally Under Seal** -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Chart Inc., Petitioner Stephen E. Norris, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to file document under seal filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Chart Inc., Petitioner Stephen E. Norris, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Chart Inc. Attorney: Stephen E. Norris **REDACTED VERSION**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Timely petition for review without motion to file under seal. Counsel has been notified to resubmit with the motion ASAP deem timely file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: A164120; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CJC19005021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific MSO, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Prelude Fertility, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Chart Inc. is a litigant