This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/10/2022 at 00:50:13 (UTC).

CHARLES v. SUTTER HOME WINERY

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 CHARLES filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SUTTER HOME WINERY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9411

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Doris Charles

Alvin Jones

Jennifer Peltier

Respondents and Defendants

Varni Brothers Corporation

Winery Exchange, Inc.

Raymond Vineyard and Cellar, Inc.

The Wine Group, Inc.

Sonoma Wine Co., LLC

Constellation Brands U.S. Operations, Inc.

Oakville Winery Management Corp.

Califonia Natural Products

Bronco Wine Company

Rebel Wine Co., LLC

Don Sebastiani & Sons International Wine Negociants, Corp.

F. Korbel & Bros.

Trader Joe's Company

Beringer Vineyards

Sutter Home Winery, Inc.

Jean-Claude Boisset Wines, USA, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Xavier Becerra

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. Kabateck

Drew R. Ferrandini

Stuart B. Esner

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Carl Brandon Wisoff

R. Christopher Locke

Erin Rose Ranahan

Kerry C. Fowler

Frederick L. McKnight

Erin R. Ranahan

Bruce E. Copeland

Lauren Marian Michals

Ninos Paul Saroukhanioff

James M. Schurz

Steven Edward Bledsoe

Steven Alan Haskins

Dawn Sestito

Charles H. Moellenberg

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Harrison Martin Pollak

Other Attorneys

Ninos Saroukhanioff

Carl B. Wisoff

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied; CA opinion decertified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; CA opinion decertified; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing partial depublication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal is denied. On the Court's own motion, the Court of Appeals opinion is ordered depublished. The Reporter of Decisions is directed not to publish in the Official Appellate Reports the opinion in the above-entitled appeal filed on May 9, 2018, which appears at 23 Cal.App.5th 89. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1125.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Doris Charles Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Alvin Jones Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Jason Peltier Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Jennifer Peltier Attorney: Stuart B. Esner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Service copy of answer to petition for review filed electronically on 7/9/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: The Wine Group, LLC Attorney: Carl B. Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Constellation Brands U.S. Operations, Inc. Attorney: Bruce E. Copeland Attorney: Lauren Marian Michals Defendant and Respondent: Sonoma Wine Co., LLC Attorney: Erin R. Ranahan Defendant and Respondent: Trader Joe's Company Attorney: Dawn Sestito Defendant and Respondent: F. Korbel & Bros. Attorney: Robert C. O'Brien Attorney: Steven Alan Haskins Attorney: Steven Edward Bledsoe Defendant and Respondent: Sutter Home Winery, Inc. Attorney: Frederick L. McKnight Attorney: Kerry C. Fowler Defendant and Respondent: Califonia Natural Products Attorney: James M. Schurz Defendant and Respondent: Mason Cellars Attorney: Ninos Saroukhanioff Defendant and Respondent: Oakville Winery Management Corp. Attorney: Ninos Paul Saroukhanioff Defendant and Respondent: Winery Exchange, Inc. Attorney: Erin Rose Ranahan Defendant and Respondent: Treasury Wine Estates Americas Company Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Treasury Wine Estates Holding, Inc. Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Beringer Vineyards Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: The Wine Group, Inc. Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Golden State Vintners Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Varni Brothers Corporation Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Fetzer Vineyards Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Bronco Wine Company Attorney: Carl Brandon Wisoff Attorney: R. Christopher Locke Defendant and Respondent: Rebel Wine Co., LLC Attorney: Frederick L. McKnight Attorney: Kerry C. Fowler Defendant and Respondent: Don Sebastiani & Sons International Wine Negociants, Corp. Attorney: Frederick L. McKnight Attorney: Kerry C. Fowler Defendant and Respondent: Jean-Claude Boisset Wines, USA, Inc. Attorney: Frederick L. McKnight Attorney: Kerry C. Fowler Defendant and Respondent: Raymond Vineyard and Cellar, Inc. Attorney: Frederick L. McKnight Attorney: Kerry C. Fowler

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Xavier Becerra Attorney: Harrison Martin Pollak

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: one doghouse.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Doris Charles Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Alvin Jones Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Jason Peltier Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Jennifer Peltier Attorney: Stuart B. Esner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Doris Charles Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Alvin Jones Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Jason Peltier Attorney: Stuart B. Esner Plaintiff and Appellant: Jennifer Peltier Attorney: Stuart B. Esner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B275295; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC576061

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less