This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/27/2023 at 01:48:49 (UTC).

Chamberlain et al. v. Fern et al.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Chamberlain filed an Other lawsuit against Fern. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bauer, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2316

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bauer, Ronald

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

David Chamberlain

Linda Chamberlain

Respondents and Defendants

Martin D. Fern

Linda Taylor-Fern

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Norma V Garcia

Gregory S. Page

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Robin Meadow

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred.; Notes: Appellants' motion for judicial notice filed on May 3, 2023, and respondents' opposition thereto, will be decided in conjunction with the decision on appeal. The parties may discuss the matters of which judicial notice is requested in any briefs remaining to be filed. However, if the court does not take judicial notice of any of the requested matters any discussion of those matters in the briefs will be disregarded. Respondents' application for an extension of time to file a respondent's brief is GRANTED. Respondents shall serve and file their respondent's brief within 30 days of the date of this order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: Paid by respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellants' request for judicial notice in support of their opening brief on the merits along with respondent's opposition, and application for extension of time to file the RB.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Respondent's application to extend the deadline for filing the respondent's brief until 30 days after the court rules on appellant's motion for judicial notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Respondent's opposition to appellant's motion for judicial notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Appellants' motion requesting judicial notice in support of their opening brief on the merits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David Chamberlain Attorney: Norma V Garcia 11 volumes of appendixes, pages 1-2913.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/22/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Martin D. FernAttorney: Robin Meadow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: David ChamberlainAttorney: Norma V Garcia; Notes: 11 volumes of appendixes, pages 1-2913.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1: 302 pages (electronic)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record returned to county for corrections.; Notes: RT is missing "Division Three" in the caption on the front cover.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's aob, appendix and motion was rejected. The reporter's transcript has not been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: K. Reitan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on 02-23-2023 (Proceeding under rule 8.124 with rt)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: David and Linda Chamberlain

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2015-00826601; Trial Court Judge: Bauer, Ronald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less