This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/03/2022 at 08:17:43 (UTC).

Chaganti v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Chaganti filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8373

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Zayner, Theodore

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Naren Chaganti

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

Interested Parties

New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC

Cricket Communications Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Raymond P. Bolanos

Attorney at AT&T Services Legal Department

430 Bush Street, 3Rd Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jon Mark Thacker

Attorney at Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley

50 W San Fernando St #1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Terry Anastassiou

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

1001 Marshall Street, Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

 

Court Documents

H048373

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Remanded to trial court with directions; Disposition Type: Final (CERTIFIED FOR PUBLICATION) Disposition: The writ of error coram vobis is granted The superior court is directed to vacate the judgment and the order granting summary adjudication. Chaganti shall recover his costs in this writ proceeding. (FDE, AMD, CEW); Publication Status: By the Court - Published; Author: Elia, Franklin D.; Participants: Wilson II, Charles E. (Concur) Danner, Allison M. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (CERTIFIED FOR PUBLICATION) Disposition: The writ of error coram vobis is granted The superior court is directed to vacate the judgment and the order granting summary adjudication. Chaganti shall recover his costs in this writ proceeding. (FDE, AMD, CEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice granted.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Petitioner's January 25, 2021 second request for judicial notice is granted as to exhibits 4 and 5 only and denied as to the remaining exhibits. Petitioner's September 20, 2021 third request for judicial notice is granted as to exhibits 17 and 19 only and denied as to the remaining exhibits. Real parties' September 13, 2021 request for judicial notice is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Submission order filed.; Notes: The cause herein is ordered submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived by: (no response - 10 day notice); Notes: Both parties; request for oral argument was due 11/12/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: November 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Real parties in interest's withdrawal of oral argument.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: By Real Party in Interest attorney, Jon Mark Thacker. Exhibits submitted in support of opposition by Real Party in Interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Atty Terry Anastassiou for Real Party in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: The time for filing a voluntary preliminary opposition has passed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The petition, filed with this court on August 27, 2020, was not accompained by the $775.00 statutory filing fee. The court will strike the filing of the petition if the fee or a waiver is not received within 5 court days from the date of this notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Petitioner's first request for judicial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Vol. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Coram Vobis

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cricket Communications, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where New Cingular Wireless Pcs, LLC doing business as AT&T Mobility is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thacker, J. Mark