This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/11/2022 at 00:38:45 (UTC).

Chadbourne et al. v. Fay Loan Servicing et al.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Chadbourne filed an Other lawsuit against Fay Loan Servicing. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wood, Victoria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4462

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wood, Victoria

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Bruce Chadbourne

Mohammad Khan

Defendants and Respondents

Fay Loan Servicing

Wilmington Trust

Bank of America, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Mainak D'Attaray

Attorney at Law Office of Mainak D'Attaray

10262 Foothill Boulevard

Lake View Terrace, CA 91342

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

T. Robert Finlay

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak LLP

4665 Macarthur Court - Suite 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Todd Evan Chvat

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak

4665 Macarthur Court - Suite 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kristina M. Pelletier

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak LLP

4665 Macarthur Court, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bruce Chadbourne Attorney: Mainak D'Attaray Notice of entry and judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bruce ChadbourneAttorney: Mainak D'Attaray; Notes: Notice of entry and judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid via credit card by Mainak D'Attaray, attorney for appellant Chadbourne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Deadline was 02/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: Feb. 17, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/31/2022 by Counsel for Plaintiffs Bruce Chadbourne and Mohammad Khan appealing judgment from 12/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Napa County Superior Court - Main; County: Napa; Trial Court Case Number: 19CV000046; Trial Court Judge: Wood, Victoria

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pelletier, Kristina Marie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T Robert Finlay