This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/02/2022 at 16:07:55 (UTC).

Cervantes v. The Superior Court of San Diego County/Wanis View Estates Homeowners Association

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Cervantes filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Diego County/Wanis View Estates Homeowners Association. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Freeland, Cynthia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9438

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Freeland, Cynthia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tabitha Ann Cervantes

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Party

Wanis View Estates Homeowners Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Craig Lubin

Attorney at LUBIN PHAM + CAPLIN LLP

19200 Von Karman, Ste. 400

Irvine, CA 92612

Namson Nguyen Pham

Attorney at LUBIN PHAM + CAPLIN LLP

19200 Von Karman, Ste. 400

Irvine, CA 92612

JC Chimoures

Attorney at LUBIN PHAM + CAPLIN LLP

19200 Von Karman, Ste. 400

Irvine, CA 92612

Interested Party Attorneys

Carrie Netterville Heieck

Attorney at Tinnelly Law Group

27101 Puerta Real, Ste 250

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Sarah Angela Kyriakedes

Attorney at Tinnelly Law Group

27101 Puerta Real Ste 250

Mission Viejo, CA 92691-8545

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The verified petition for peremptory writ of mandate or other appropriate relief has been read and considered by Justices O'Rourke, Aaron and Guerrero. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition (nine volumes)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with stay request

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of San Diego County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah A. Kyriakedes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heieck, Carrie N.